ND HB1328 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-12 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 60
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 15-10-17 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the rate of tuition at institutions of higher education; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
The rate of tuition at institutions of higher education; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Kylie Oversen [D] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Alex Looysen [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] |
Rep. Corey Mock [D] | Rep. Marie Strinden [D] | Sen. Tyler Axness [D] | Sen. Mac Schneider [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-12 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 29 nays 60 |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 2 1 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-17 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Education Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1328.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0479-01000.pdf |