ND HB1328 | 2011-2012 | 62nd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on April 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-21 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 35-17-04, 35-29-05, 35-30-02, 35-31-02, and 47-16-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the procedure for filing an agister's lien, the fees for filing federal tax liens, the procedure to file a processor's lien, the procedure to file an agricultural supplier's lien in the office of the secretary of state or a county recorder, and the procedure to file a landlord's lien in the office of a county recorder.
Title
The procedure for filing an agister's lien, the fees for filing federal tax liens, the procedure to file a processor's lien, the procedure to file an agricultural supplier's lien in the office of the secretary of state or a county recorder, and the procedure to file a landlord's lien in the office of a county recorder.
Sponsors
Sen. John Andrist [R] | Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] | Rep. Joyce Kingsbury [R] | Rep. Mark Owens [R] |
Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] | Rep. Vicky Steiner [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-21 | Filed with Secretary Of State 04/19 | |
2011-04-20 | Signed by Governor 04/19 | |
2011-04-18 | Signed by Speaker | |
2011-04-08 | Signed by President | |
2011-04-07 | Concurred | |
2011-03-25 | Returned to House (12) | |
2011-03-24 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 | |
2011-03-23 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-03-22 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 | |
2011-03-15 | Committee Hearing 10:45 | |
2011-02-22 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee | |
2011-01-31 | Received from House | |
2011-01-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 75 nays 16 | |
2011-01-27 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2011-01-26 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2 | |
2011-01-25 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2011-01-17 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |