ND HB1327 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-13 - Signed by Governor 03/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 39-06.1-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the fee for failure to stop at a stop sign; and to provide a penalty.
Title
The fee for failure to stop at a stop sign; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Patrick Hatlestad [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Sen. David Clemens [R] |
Sen. Jim Dotzenrod [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-04 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 39 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-01-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 56 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-13 | House | Signed by Governor 03/12 |
2019-03-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2019-03-07 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Signed by President |
2019-03-05 | House | Returned to House |
2019-03-04 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 39 nays 6 |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2019-02-28 | Senate | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-02-18 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2019-01-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2019-01-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 56 nays 36 |
2019-01-22 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-01-21 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 4 3 |
2019-01-18 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |