ND HB1327 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 66
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 54-21.3-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to exceptions from inspections for home repairs performed by a homeowner.
Title
Exceptions from inspections for home repairs performed by a homeowner.
Sponsors
Rep. Tom Kading [R] | Rep. Vernon Laning [R] | Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Cynthia Schreiber-Beck [R] |
Rep. Kathy Skroch [R] | Rep. Nathan Toman [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 24 N: 66 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 66 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 08:00 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee |