ND 1326 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 40-57.1-02 and 40-57.1-03, subsection 4 of section 40-58-20, sections 40-58-20.2 and 40-63-03, subsections 35, 36, and 42 of section 57-02-08, and section 57-02.2-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to approval from impacted municipalities for the grant of local property tax incentives.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Approval from impacted municipalities for the grant of local property tax incentives.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 33 N: 57 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-15HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 33 nays 57
2017-02-08HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 3 1
2017-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback