ND HB1326 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-01-29 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection
Title
Covering a load in a vehicle and fee for a violation.
Sponsors
Rep. Jay Seibel [R] | Rep. Jason Dockter [R] | Rep. Ben Koppelman [R] | Rep. Vernon Laning [R] |
Rep. Gary Sukut [R] | Sen. Jon Casper [R] | Sen. Jessica Unruh Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 23 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-01-29 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 23 nays 68 |
2015-01-26 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2015-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |