ND 1323 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 23-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limitations on mask wearing requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Limitations on mask wearing requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 66 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Passed over veto, (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-12 - House - House Second reading (Y: 67 N: 24 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-07 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-22 - House - House Second reading (Y: 50 N: 44 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/27
2021-04-22SenatePassed over veto, yeas 32 nays 15
2021-04-22SenateConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-22HousePassed over veto, yeas 66 nays 27
2021-04-22HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-22HouseVetoed by Governor 04/21
2021-04-16HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-16HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-16SenateSigned by President
2021-04-12HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 67 nays 24
2021-04-12HouseConcurred
2021-04-07HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-04-07SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 30 nays 17
2021-04-07SenateAmendment adopted
2021-04-07SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-04-06SenateReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-04-01SenateCommittee Hearing 08:30
2021-02-23SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-23SenateReceived from House
2021-02-22HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 50 nays 44
2021-02-19HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-12HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 9 5 0
2021-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback