ND HB1323 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 6 of section 12.1-01-04, subsection 1 of section 62.1-01-01, and section 62.1-04-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the definition of dangerous weapon.
Title
The definition of dangerous weapon.
Sponsors
Rep. Gary Paur [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] |
Sen. Jerry Klein [R] | Sen. Janne Myrdal [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 17 N: 75 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-18 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 17 nays 75 |
2019-02-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0 |
2019-01-17 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |