ND HB1323 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Signed by Governor 04/04
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 39-21-41.2 and 39-21-41.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to child restraint devices and use of safety belts for children.
Title
Child restraint devices and use of safety belts for children.
Sponsors
Rep. Mark Owens [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Gary Sukut [R] |
Sen. Brad Bekkedahl [R] | Sen. Curtiss Kreun [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 64 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 30 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | House | Signed by Governor 04/04 |
2017-04-03 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-03 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-31 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 64 nays 25 |
2017-03-31 | House | Concurred |
2017-03-17 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-16 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 30 nays 16 |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 25 |
2017-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 1 3 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |