ND 1322 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 28-32-14 and 28-32-17 and subsection 1 of section 28-32-18 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the attorney general's review of proposed administrative rules and the authority of the administrative rules committee to object to or void an administrative rule.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The attorney general's review of proposed administrative rules and the authority of the administrative rules committee to object to or void an administrative rule.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 18 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-23HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 76
2021-02-15HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-10HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-04HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0
2021-01-26HouseCommittee Hearing 03:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback