ND 1322 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 86
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new subsection to section 62.1-04-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the destruction of records pertaining to class 1 and class 2 firearm and dangerous weapon licenses.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The destruction of records pertaining to class 1 and class 2 firearm and dangerous weapon licenses.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 7 N: 86 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 7 nays 86
2019-02-18HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-02-15HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 14 0 0
2019-01-17HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback