ND 1322 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on March 30 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-30 - Signed by Governor 03/29
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 58-18-08 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to township bonding authority.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Township bonding authority.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-17 - House - House Second reading (Y: 54 N: 32 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-30HouseSigned by Governor 03/29
2017-03-27HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-27HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-24SenateSigned by President
2017-03-23HouseReturned to House
2017-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 47 nays 0
2017-03-20SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-17HouseEmergency clause failed
2017-02-17HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 54 nays 32
2017-02-10HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 10 2 3
2017-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback