ND HB1321 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 57-38 and a new subdivision to subsection 7 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an income tax credit for taxpayers whose children receive nonpublic school or home education; and to provide an effective date.
Title
An income tax credit for taxpayers whose children receive nonpublic school or home education; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 40 N: 52 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2019-02-13 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 40 nays 52 |
2019-02-07 | House | Laid over one legislative day |
2019-02-05 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2019-02-04 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 8 6 0 |
2019-01-28 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |