ND HB1321 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 4 of section 39-12-05.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to weight limitations for vehicles on highways other than the interstate system.
Title
Weight limitations for vehicles on highways other than the interstate system.
Sponsors
Rep. Craig Johnson [R] | Rep. Dick Anderson [R] | Rep. Dennis Johnson [R] | Rep. Terry Jones [R] |
Sen. Donald Schaible [R] | Sen. Terry Wanzek [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 86 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-30 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-02-20 - House - House Second reading (Y: 53 N: 38 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-13 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2017-04-07 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-04-06 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 86 nays 6 |
2017-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2017-04-03 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 46 nays 0 |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Rereferred to Transportation |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0 |
2017-03-17 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
2017-02-21 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-20 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 53 nays 38 |
2017-02-10 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 7 6 1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 09:45 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |