ND 1320 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 14 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-04-26 - Laid on table
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the Theodore Roosevelt presidential library and museum endowment fund; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to authorize a loan; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The Theodore Roosevelt presidential library and museum endowment fund; to provide a continuing appropriation; to provide for a transfer; to authorize a loan; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-02-13 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-26HouseLaid on table
2019-04-23HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-04-22HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-04-19HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-04-18HouseLaid over one legislative day
2019-04-17HouseReturned to House (12)
2019-04-17SenateEmergency clause carried
2019-04-17SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 34 nays 13
2019-04-17SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2019-04-16SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 4 2 0
2019-04-15SenateRereferred to Energy and Natural Resources
2019-04-12SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-01SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-02-14SenateReceived from House
2019-02-13HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19
2019-02-07HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 9 1 4
2019-02-01HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback