ND 1320 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-13 - Signed by Governor 04/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 39-12-02 and 39-12-03 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a uniform truck permitting system for oversized or overweight vehicles and local authority to limit use of vehicles on highways; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A uniform truck permitting system for oversized or overweight vehicles and local authority to limit use of vehicles on highways; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2017-03-27 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-04-13HouseSigned by Governor 04/13
2017-04-12HouseSent to Governor
2017-04-10HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-04-07SenateSigned by President
2017-04-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 87 nays 0
2017-04-05HouseConcurred
2017-03-28HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-03-27SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 45 nays 0
2017-03-27SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-03-24SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 03:15
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0
2017-02-07HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-06HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 12 0 2
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 09:15
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback