ND 1318 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-18 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 15.1-19 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the adoption of a restraint and seclusion policy by school districts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The adoption of a restraint and seclusion policy by school districts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 26 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 26 nays 68
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Education Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback