ND HB1317 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-09 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 54-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to a transfer of legacy fund earnings.
Title
A transfer of legacy fund earnings.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-02-09 - House - House Second reading (Y: 4 N: 87 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-09 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 4 nays 87 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 19 0 2 |
2017-01-26 | House | Committee Hearing 02:15 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |