ND 1316 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-2)
Status: Passed on March 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 32-12.2-15 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to contracts limiting liability to the state; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Contracts limiting liability to the state; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-11 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 45 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 88 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-03-23HouseSigned by Governor 03/22
2021-03-18HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-18HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-16SenateSigned by President
2021-03-12HouseReturned to House
2021-03-11SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 45 nays 2, Emergency clause carried
2021-03-10SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2021-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee
2021-02-19SenateReceived from House
2021-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 88 nays 4, Emergency clause carried
2021-02-11HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-10HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-02-09HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback