ND HB1316 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 4-1)
Status: Passed on March 23 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-23 - Signed by Governor 03/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 5 of section 44-06.1-01, section 44-06.1-17, subsections 5 and 9 of section 44-06.1-20, subsection 2 of section 44-06.1-21, subsections 6, 7, and 8 of section 44-06.1-23, and section 44-06.1-27 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to notarial acts, notary commissions, and notary public name and address changes.
Title
Notarial acts, notary commissions, and notary public name and address changes.
Sponsors
Rep. Lawrence Klemin [R] | Rep. Kim Koppelman [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] | Sen. John Grabinger [D] |
Sen. David Hogue [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-13 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Signed by Governor 03/22 |
2017-03-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2017-03-15 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Signed by President |
2017-03-14 | House | Returned to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Second reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 2 |
2017-03-10 | Senate | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0 |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |
2017-02-20 | Senate | Received from House |
2017-02-10 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 0 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 2 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2017-01-16 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |