ND HB1316 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Passed on April 12 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-12 - Signed by Governor 04/12
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to create and enact two new sections to chapter 47-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to good funds and disclosures for real estate transactions; and to amend and reenact sections 47-34-01 and 47-34-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to good funds for real estate transactions.
Title
Good funds for real estate transactions.
Sponsors
Rep. Scott Louser [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Rick Becker [R] | Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] |
Rep. Alon Wieland [R] | Sen. Karen Krebsbach [R] | Sen. Judy Lee [R] | Sen. Nicole Poolman [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-12 | House | Signed by Governor 04/12 |
2013-04-11 | House | Sent to Governor |
2013-04-08 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2013-04-05 | Senate | Signed by President |
2013-04-04 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0 |
2013-04-04 | House | Concurred |
2013-03-26 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2013-03-25 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 47 nays 0 |
2013-03-22 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-03-21 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2013-03-20 | Senate | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received from House |
2013-02-08 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 89 nays 0 |
2013-02-07 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2013-02-06 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 14 0 1 |
2013-02-05 | House | Committee Hearing 11:00 |
2013-02-04 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2013-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 04:15 |
2013-01-23 | House | Committee Hearing 02:00 |
2013-01-15 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |