ND HB1316 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 036
Status: Engrossed on February 25 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-04-02 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 036
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Fischer, Marcellais A BILL for an Act to provide for a transfer to return to the breeders' fund certain moneys paid from that fund for racing purses.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Fischer, Marcellais A BILL for an Act to provide for a transfer to return to the breeders' fund certain moneys paid from that fund for racing purses.
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Boehning [R] | Rep. Gary Kreidt [R] | Rep. Shirley Meyer [D] | Rep. Nelson [?] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-02 | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 011 nays 036 | |
2009-04-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-04-01 | Reported back amend, dnp, placed on calendar y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-09 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 091 nays 003 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 013 n 000 | |
2009-01-30 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1316.html |