ND 1315 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-16 - Division B lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subdivision i of subsection 1 of section 39-09-02 and section 39-09-09 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to speed limitations on multilane highways and minimum speed limits; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Speed limitations on multilane highways and minimum speed limits; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-16HouseDivision B lost
2021-02-16HouseDivision A lost
2021-02-16HouseDivision of bill
2021-02-09HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-08HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
2021-02-04HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback