ND HB1315 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 8-4)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-20 - Motion to reconsider failed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 50 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to community transitional housing; to provide a report; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Title
Community transitional housing; to provide a report; to provide an appropriation; and to provide an expiration date.
Sponsors
Rep. Aaron Mcwilliams [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Rep. Mike Lefor [R] | Rep. Corey Mock [D] |
Rep. Jon Nelson [R] | Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Bernie Satrom [R] | Rep. Luke Simons [R] |
Sen. Kathy Hogan [D] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] | Sen. Diane Larson [R] | Sen. Tim Mathern [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 47 N: 46 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-20 | House | Motion to reconsider failed |
2019-02-19 | House | Second reading, failed, lacks constitutional majority yeas 47 nays 46 |
2019-02-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 20 0 1 |
2019-02-06 | House | Rereferred to Appropriations |
2019-02-06 | House | Amendment adopted |
2019-02-05 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1 |
2019-01-16 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee |