ND 1313 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 9 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-09 - Signed by Governor 04/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 54-12-34 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the collection of data on missing persons.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The collection of data on missing persons.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-02-18 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-09HouseSigned by Governor 04/08
2019-04-03HouseSent to Governor
2019-04-03HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-04-02SenateSigned by President
2019-03-29HouseReturned to House
2019-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-03-28SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-03-26SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-03-19SenateRereferred to Appropriations
2019-03-19SenateReported back, do pass 5 0 1
2019-03-19SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-19SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2019-02-19SenateReceived from House
2019-02-18HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2019-02-14HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 19 0 2
2019-02-06HouseRereferred to Appropriations
2019-02-06HouseAmendment adopted
2019-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2019-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback