ND 1312 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Passed on March 11 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-03-11 - Signed by Governor 03/08
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 35-24-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to definitions pertaining to a well or pipeline construction lien.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Definitions pertaining to a well or pipeline construction lien.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-01-29 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-11HouseSigned by Governor 03/08
2019-03-06HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-06HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-05SenateSigned by President
2019-03-04HouseReturned to House
2019-03-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-02-28SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-02-28SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee
2019-01-30SenateReceived from House
2019-01-29HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2019-01-25HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback