ND 1311 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-19 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Possession of a firearm or dangerous weapon at a public gathering.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2021-02-19 - House - House Second reading (Y: 30 N: 62 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-19HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 43 nays 49
2021-02-19HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-19HouseDivision B adopted
2021-02-19HouseDivision A lost
2021-02-19HouseDivision of amendment
2021-02-18HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 6 0
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 03:00
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback