ND 1311 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on April 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/28
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 54-12-33 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to law enforcement training on missing and murdered indigenous people.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Law enforcement training on missing and murdered indigenous people.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-02-05 - House - House Second reading (Y: 90 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/28
2019-03-28HouseSent to Governor
2019-03-28HouseSigned by Speaker
2019-03-27SenateSigned by President
2019-03-25HouseReturned to House
2019-03-22SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 0
2019-03-20SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2019-03-20SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2019-02-18SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2019-02-06SenateReceived from House
2019-02-05HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 90 nays 2
2019-01-30HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 13 0 1
2019-01-15HouseCommittee Hearing 10:15
2019-01-03HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback