ND 1310 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 22 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-28 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 62.1-02 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the creation of a pilot program to allow the carrying of a concealed firearm on school property by qualified individuals; to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to an exception to the prohibition against possessing a firearm at a public gathering; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

An exception to the prohibition against possessing a firearm at a public gathering; to provide for a report to the legislative management; and to provide an expiration date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 18 N: 27 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 73 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-28SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 18 nays 27
2017-03-27SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 1 0
2017-03-14SenateCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-02-22SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-22SenateReceived from House
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 73 nays 19
2017-02-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-20HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
2017-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback