ND 1309 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 11-0)
Status: Passed on April 19 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-19 - Signed by Governor 04/16
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact section 57-40.2-03.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to payment of use tax by contractors; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Payment of use tax by contractors; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-01 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 43 N: 4 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-01-27 - House - House Second reading (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-19HouseSigned by Governor 04/16
2021-04-14HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-14HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-06SenateSigned by President
2021-04-05HouseReturned to House
2021-04-01SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 43 nays 4
2021-03-31SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 5 2 0
2021-03-09SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee
2021-01-28SenateReceived from House
2021-01-27HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 91 nays 0
2021-01-22HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-21HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 13 0 1
2021-01-18HouseCommittee Hearing 09:30
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback