ND 1308 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 12-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 17 2017 - 50% progression
Action: 2017-03-16 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 25
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 50-09-29 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to mandatory addiction screening for temporary assistance for needy families program individual employment plan participants; and to provide an effective date.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Mandatory addiction screening for temporary assistance for needy families program individual employment plan participants; and to provide an effective date.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 21 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2017-02-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 77 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-16SenateSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 25
2017-03-15SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 4 3 0
2017-03-13SenateCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee
2017-02-17SenateReceived from House
2017-02-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 77 nays 12
2017-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-07HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 10 2 2
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 02:30
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback