ND 1307 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-04 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 68
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to prohibit public accommodations from refusing services to an individual because the individual has not been vaccinated; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to prohibit public accommodations from refusing services to an individual because the individual has not been vaccinated; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-04 - House - House Second reading (Y: 24 N: 68 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 24 nays 68
2021-02-02HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 3 0
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback