ND HB1305 | 2019-2020 | 66th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-06 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new chapter to title 51 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to product repair practices; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Product repair practices; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 10 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-06 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 10 nays 82 |
2019-02-01 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 1 3 |
2019-01-30 | House | Committee Hearing 02:30 |
2019-01-03 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee |