ND 1305 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 6-1)
Status: Passed on March 24 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-24 - Signed by Governor 03/24
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to amend and reenact sections 2-06-01, 2-06-01.1, 2-06-01.2, 2-06-02, 2-06-03, 2-06-04, 2-06-06, 2-06-07, 2-06-08, 2-06-09, 2-06-10, 2-06-11, 2-06-12, 2-06-13, 2-06-14, 2-06-15, 2-06-16, 2-06-17, 2-06-18, 2-06-19, 2-06-20, 2-06-21, and 2-06-22 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the form and style of statutes governing airport authorities; and to repeal sections 2-06-05 and 2-06-23 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to airport authorities.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Airport authorities.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-03-17 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2017-01-31 - House - House Second reading (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-24HouseSigned by Governor 03/24
2017-03-22HouseSent to Governor
2017-03-22HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-03-21SenateSigned by President
2017-03-20HouseReturned to House
2017-03-17SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 46 nays 0
2017-03-16SenateReported back, do pass, place on calendar 6 0 0
2017-03-10SenateCommittee Hearing 09:30
2017-02-20SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Government and Veterans Affairs Committee
2017-02-20SenateReceived from House
2017-01-31HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 93 nays 0
2017-01-26HouseReported back, do pass, place on calendar 14 0 0
2017-01-23HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2017-01-16HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback