ND 1304 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-24 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact subsection 1 of section 62.1-03-01 and section 62.1-03-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to carrying a handgun; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Carrying a handgun; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 12 N: 82 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-24HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 12 nays 82
2021-02-19HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 1 0
2021-01-22HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2021-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback