ND 1304 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on March 2 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-03-02 - Signed by Governor 02/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 12.1-31 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting the wearing of masks, hoods, and face coverings during the commission of a criminal offense; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting the wearing of masks, hoods, and face coverings during the commission of a criminal offense; to provide a penalty; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-21 - House - House Second reading (Y: 76 N: 16 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-16 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 33 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2017-02-06 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-03-02HouseSigned by Governor 02/23
2017-02-21HouseSent to Governor
2017-02-21HouseSigned by Speaker
2017-02-21SenateSigned by President
2017-02-21HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 76 nays 16, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-21HouseConcurred
2017-02-17HouseReturned to House (12)
2017-02-16SenateEmergency clause carried
2017-02-16SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 33 nays 12
2017-02-16SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-15SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 5 1 0
2017-02-13SenateCommittee Hearing 09:00
2017-02-07SenateIntroduced, first reading, (emergency), referred Judiciary Committee
2017-02-06SenateReceived from House
2017-02-06HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 22, Emergency clause carried
2017-02-03HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2017-02-02HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 9 5 1
2017-01-24HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback