ND 1303 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 9-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression
Action: 2021-02-17 - Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
Pending: Joint Political Subdivisions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of noncompliance with open records requirements by county commissions and auditors, city councils and commissions, and school districts; and bypassing voter approval requirements.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

A BILL for an Act to provide for a legislative management study of noncompliance with open records requirements by county commissions and auditors, city councils and commissions, and school districts; and bypassing voter approval requirements.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-17SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee
2021-02-16SenateReceived from House
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 94 nays 0
2021-02-08HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-05HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 0 3
2021-01-28HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback