ND 1301 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-04 - Division B lost
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to provide for limits on access to vaccination status and records; to create and enact a new section to chapter 32-03 and a new section to chapter 34-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to civil immunity for communicable diseases and mandatory communicable disease immunizations; to provide a penalty; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Civil immunity for communicable diseases and mandatory communicable disease immunizations; to provide a penalty; to provide for application; and to declare an emergency.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-04HouseDivision B lost
2021-02-04HouseDivision A lost
2021-02-04HouseDivision of bill
2021-02-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-03HouseReported back amended, without recommendation 10 4 0
2021-01-27HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback