ND 1301 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 36-21.2-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bonding for the cost of care for animals seized by law enforcement.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Bonding for the cost of care for animals seized by law enforcement.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-02-10HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
2017-02-03HouseReported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 1
2017-02-02HouseCommittee Hearing 10:00
2017-01-12HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback