ND HB1301 | 2017-2018 | 65th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 7-2)
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 12 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-02-10 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact section 36-21.2-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to bonding for the cost of care for animals seized by law enforcement.
Title
Bonding for the cost of care for animals seized by law enforcement.
Sponsors
Rep. Dwight Kiefert [R] | Rep. Thomas Beadle [R] | Rep. Jake Blum [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Rep. Alisa Mitskog [D] | Sen. Tom Campbell [R] | Sen. Dick Dever [R] | Sen. Scott Meyer [R] |
Sen. Larry Robinson [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-02-10 - House - House Second reading (Y: 14 N: 76 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-02-10 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 14 nays 76 |
2017-02-03 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 10 4 1 |
2017-02-02 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2017-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Political Subdivisions Committee |