ND 1299 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 8-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-01-26 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 70
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 51-07 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to prohibiting a retail establishment from refusing to accept cash as payment; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Prohibiting a retail establishment from refusing to accept cash as payment; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-01-26 - House - House Second reading (Y: 21 N: 70 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-01-26HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 21 nays 70
2021-01-21HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-20HouseReported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-19HouseCommittee Hearing 08:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback