ND 1298 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 10-0)
Status: Vetoed on April 22 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-27 - Filed with Secretary Of State 04/27
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact a new section to chapter 14-02.4 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to participation in athletic events exclusively for males or females; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Participation in athletic events exclusively for males or females; and to provide for a legislative management study.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-04-22 - Senate - Senate Veto sustained, (Y: 28 N: 19 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-22 - House - House Passed over veto, (Y: 68 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-15 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 29 N: 18 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-14 - House - House Second reading (Y: 69 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-29 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 32 N: 15 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-11 - House - House Second reading (Y: 65 N: 26 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-27HouseFiled with Secretary Of State 04/27
2021-04-22SenateVeto sustained, yeas 28 nays 19
2021-04-22SenateConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-22HousePassed over veto, yeas 68 nays 25
2021-04-22HouseConsideration of Governor's veto
2021-04-22HouseVetoed by Governor 04/21
2021-04-20HouseSent to Governor
2021-04-20HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-04-19SenateSigned by President
2021-04-15SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 27 nays 20
2021-04-15SenateConference committee report adopted
2021-04-15SenateReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-14HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 69 nays 25
2021-04-14HouseConference committee report adopted
2021-04-14HouseReported back from conference committee, amend, placed on calendar
2021-04-06SenateConference committee appointed Dwyer Myrdal Bakke
2021-04-05HouseConference committee appointed Skroch Rohr Schneider
2021-04-05HouseRefused to concur
2021-03-30HouseReturned to House (12)
2021-03-29SenateSecond reading, passed as amended, yeas 32 nays 15
2021-03-29SenateAmendment adopted
2021-03-29SenateAmendment proposed on floor
2021-03-29SenateAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-03-26SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-24SenateRereferred to Judiciary
2021-03-23SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 6 1 0
2021-03-16SenateCommittee Hearing 02:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-12SenateReceived from House
2021-02-11HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 65 nays 26
2021-02-10HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-09HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 02:00
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 10:45
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Human Services Committee

North Dakota State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/bill-actions/ba1298.html
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-01000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-01009a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-02000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-03000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-02005a.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-04000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-05000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-06000.pdf
Texthttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/documents/21-0140-07000.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-26.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-54.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-65.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-66.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/hr-dailyjnl-71.pdf
Roll Callhttps://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/67-2021/journals/sr-dailyjnl-71.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback