ND HB1298 | 2015-2016 | 64th Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 11-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 74
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to amend and reenact sections 57-38-01.28 and 57-38-30 and subsection 1 and subdivision d of subsection 2 of section 57-38-30.3 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to reduction of the rates of individual and corporate income taxes and an income tax exclusion for social security benefits; and to provide an effective date.
Title
Reduction of the rates of individual and corporate income taxes and an income tax exclusion for social security benefits; and to provide an effective date.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-02-23 - House - House Second reading (Y: 19 N: 74 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 19 nays 74 |
2015-02-17 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2015-02-16 | House | Reported back amended, do not pass, placed on calendar 13 0 1 |
2015-01-27 | House | Committee Hearing 10:15 |
2015-01-13 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Finance and Taxation Committee |