ND HB1298 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 8-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 77
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the board of university and school lands for a jail expansion grant program.
Title
A BILL for an Act to provide an appropriation to the board of university and school lands for a jail expansion grant program.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Roger Brabandt [R] | Rep. Robert Frantsvog [R] | Rep. Andrew Maragos [R] |
Rep. Roscoe Streyle [R] | Sen. Randall Burckhard [R] | Sen. David Hogue [R] | Sen. Oley Larsen [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 16 nays 77 |
2013-02-15 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 20 2 0 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 09:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Appropriations Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1298.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-0610-01000.pdf |