ND HB1298 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 16 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-04-17 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Nething A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 4 to section 10-19.1-124, subsection 4 to section 10-32-128, subsection 4 to section 10-33-115, chapter 10-36, and a new subsection to section 45-11-08.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limited liability companies, nonprofit corporations, nonprofit limited liability companies, and partnership fictitious names; to amend and reenact section 10-01.1-06, subsection 3 of section 10-15-36, sections 10-19.1-01 and 10-19.1-10, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-43, section 10-19.1-46, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-48, subsection 2 of section 10-19.1-51, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-75, section 10-19.1-76.2, subsection 6 of section 10-19.1-87, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-91, sections 10-19.1-105, 10-19.1-107, and 10-19.1-146, subsection 5 of section 10-19.1-148, sections 10-32-02, 10-32-04, and 10-32-06, subsection 1 of section 10-32-10, section 10-32-18, subsection 2 of section 10-32-43, section 10-32-48, subsection 1 of section 10-32-80, subsection 1 of section 10-32-85, subsection 2 of section 10-32-87, subsection 1 of section 10-32-99, subsection 4 of section 10-32-107, subsection 1 of section 10-32-109, sections 10-32-110 and 10-32-111, subsection 3 of section 10-32-149, subsection 5 of section 10-32-152, section 10-33-01, subsection 1 of section 10-33-39, subsection 1 of section 10-33-44, subsection 2 of section 10-33-46, subsection 1 of section 10-33-84, subsection 3 of section 10-33-139, subsection 5 of section 10-33-141, section 38-08.1-03, subsections 27 and 28 of section 45-10.2-02, section 45-10.2-21, subsection 3 of section 45-10.2-41, section 45-10.2-64, subsection 5 of section 45-10.2-111, subsections 17 and 18 of section 45-13-01, subsections 15 and 16 of section 45-22-01, subsection 3 of section 45-22-03, subsection 5 of section 45-22-23, and subsections 18 and 19 of section 45-23-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial registered agent listing, cooperative associations, business corporations, limited liability companies, nonprofit corporations, geophysical exploration companies, limited partnerships, general partnerships, limited liability partnerships, and limited liability limited partnerships; and to provide a penalty.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Nething A BILL for an Act to create and enact subsection 4 to section 10-19.1-124, subsection 4 to section 10-32-128, subsection 4 to section 10-33-115, chapter 10-36, and a new subsection to section 45-11-08.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to limited liability companies, nonprofit corporations, nonprofit limited liability companies, and partnership fictitious names; to amend and reenact section 10-01.1-06, subsection 3 of section 10-15-36, sections 10-19.1-01 and 10-19.1-10, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-43, section 10-19.1-46, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-48, subsection 2 of section 10-19.1-51, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-75, section 10-19.1-76.2, subsection 6 of section 10-19.1-87, subsection 1 of section 10-19.1-91, sections 10-19.1-105, 10-19.1-107, and 10-19.1-146, subsection 5 of section 10-19.1-148, sections 10-32-02, 10-32-04, and 10-32-06, subsection 1 of section 10-32-10, section 10-32-18, subsection 2 of section 10-32-43, section 10-32-48, subsection 1 of section 10-32-80, subsection 1 of section 10-32-85, subsection 2 of section 10-32-87, subsection 1 of section 10-32-99, subsection 4 of section 10-32-107, subsection 1 of section 10-32-109, sections 10-32-110 and 10-32-111, subsection 3 of section 10-32-149, subsection 5 of section 10-32-152, section 10-33-01, subsection 1 of section 10-33-39, subsection 1 of section 10-33-44, subsection 2 of section 10-33-46, subsection 1 of section 10-33-84, subsection 3 of section 10-33-139, subsection 5 of section 10-33-141, section 38-08.1-03, subsections 27 and 28 of section 45-10.2-02, section 45-10.2-21, subsection 3 of section 45-10.2-41, section 45-10.2-64, subsection 5 of section 45-10.2-111, subsections 17 and 18 of section 45-13-01, subsections 15 and 16 of section 45-22-01, subsection 3 of section 45-22-03, subsection 5 of section 45-22-23, and subsections 18 and 19 of section 45-23-01 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to commercial registered agent listing, cooperative associations, business corporations, limited liability companies, nonprofit corporations, geophysical exploration companies, limited partnerships, general partnerships, limited liability partnerships, and limited liability limited partnerships; and to provide a penalty.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-04-17 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-04-16 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-14 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-06 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-01 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 089 nays 000 | |
2009-04-01 | Concurred | |
2009-03-09 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-05 | Second reading, passed, yeas 045 nays 000 | |
2009-03-03 | Laid over one legislative day | |
2009-03-02 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-27 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-02-16 | Committee Hearing 10:30 | |
2009-02-10 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary | |
2009-02-05 | Received from House | |
2009-02-04 | Second reading, passed, yeas 093 nays 000 | |
2009-01-30 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-01-29 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 000 | |
2009-01-28 | Committee Hearing 09:00 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1298.html |