ND HB1297 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-23 - Signed by Governor 04/22
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
AN ACT to amend and reenact section 62.1-02-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the possession of firearms or dangerous weapons at a public gathering.
Title
The possession of firearms or dangerous weapons at a public gathering.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-16 - House - House Second reading (Y: 82 N: 10 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2021-04-08 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 41 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-02-24 - House - House Second reading (Y: 80 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-23 | House | Signed by Governor 04/22 |
2021-04-20 | House | Sent to Governor |
2021-04-20 | House | Signed by Speaker |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Signed by President |
2021-04-16 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 82 nays 10 |
2021-04-16 | House | Concurred |
2021-04-08 | House | Returned to House (12) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 41 nays 5 |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0 |
2021-04-06 | Senate | Committee Hearing 03:00 |
2021-04-05 | Senate | Committee Hearing 10:30 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Introduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Received from House |
2021-02-24 | House | Second reading, passed, yeas 80 nays 12 |
2021-02-23 | House | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar |
2021-02-22 | House | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 3 0 |
2021-01-22 | House | Committee Hearing 09:30 |
2021-01-12 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Energy and Natural Resources Committee |