ND 1296 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 6-3)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2021 - 25% progression
Action: 2021-02-15 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]

Summary

A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 12-44.1 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the confidentiality of booking photos; and to amend and reenact subsection 2 of section 44-04-18.7 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to criminal information.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Criminal information.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-02-15 - House - House Second reading (Y: 45 N: 49 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-02-15HouseSecond reading, failed to pass, yeas 45 nays 49
2021-02-10HouseLaid over one legislative day
2021-02-04HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-02-03HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 11 2 1
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 09:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Industry, Business and Labor Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback