ND HB1295 | 2013-2014 | 63rd Legislative Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 4-2)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-02-21 - Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
A BILL for an Act to create and enact a new section to chapter 34-06 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to motor carrier exemption.
Title
Motor carrier exemption.
Sponsors
Rep. Dan Ruby [R] | Rep. Nancy Johnson [R] | Rep. Joshua Boschee [D] | Sen. Dave Oehlke [R] |
Sen. Margaret Sitte [R] | Sen. George Sinner [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-21 | House | Second reading, failed to pass, yeas 2 nays 90 |
2013-02-14 | House | Reported back, do not pass, placed on calendar 12 1 1 |
2013-01-31 | House | Committee Hearing 10:00 |
2013-01-14 | House | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation Committee |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/bill-actions/ba1295.html |
Text | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/63-2013/documents/13-8215-01000.pdf |