ND HB1295 | 2009-2010 | 61st Legislative Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 1 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-05-04 - Filed with Secretary of State
Summary
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Miller A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 39-29.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unconventional vehicles; and to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 3 of section 39-06-14 and subsection 3 of section 39-27-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to motorcycles.
Title
Introduced by Sen. Klein, Miller A BILL for an Act to create and enact chapter 39-29.2 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to unconventional vehicles; and to amend and reenact subdivision c of subsection 3 of section 39-06-14 and subsection 3 of section 39-27-05 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to motorcycles.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-05-04 | Filed with Secretary of State | |
2009-05-01 | Signed by Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Sent to Governor | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by Speaker | |
2009-04-30 | Signed by President | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 046 nays 000 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-28 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-28 | Second reading, passed, yeas 074 nays 018 | |
2009-04-28 | Conference committee report adopted | |
2009-04-27 | Reported back from conf comm, placed on calendar (Senate recede) | |
2009-04-14 | Conf comm appointed Nodland G. Lee Potter | |
2009-04-10 | Conf comm appointed Weisz R. Kelsch Delmore | |
2009-04-10 | Refused to concur | |
2009-03-18 | Returned to House (12) | |
2009-03-17 | Second reading, passed as amended, yeas 042 nays 003 | |
2009-03-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-03-13 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 006 n 000 | |
2009-03-06 | Committee Hearing 09:30 | |
2009-02-26 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation | |
2009-02-25 | Received from House | |
2009-02-18 | Second reading, passed, yeas 085 nays 009 | |
2009-02-16 | Amendment adopted, placed on calendar | |
2009-02-16 | Reported back amended, do pass, amendment poc y 012 n 002 | |
2009-01-22 | Committee Hearing 10:15 | |
2009-01-12 | Introduced, first reading, referred Transportation |
North Dakota State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.legis.nd.gov/assembly/61-2009/bill-actions/ba1295.html |