ND 1294 | 2021-2022 | 67th Legislative Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Passed on April 1 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-04-01 - Signed by Governor 03/31
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

AN ACT to create and enact section 12-60-16.12 of the North Dakota Century Code, relating to the unauthorized dissemination of criminal history record information; and to provide a penalty.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

The unauthorized dissemination of criminal history record information; and to provide a penalty.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2021-03-24 - Senate - Senate Second reading (Y: 44 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-02-02 - House - House Second reading (Y: 81 N: 12 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2021-04-01HouseSigned by Governor 03/31
2021-03-29HouseSent to Governor
2021-03-29HouseSigned by Speaker
2021-03-26SenateSigned by President
2021-03-25HouseReturned to House
2021-03-24SenateSecond reading, passed, yeas 44 nays 3
2021-03-23SenateAmendment failed, placed on calendar
2021-03-22SenateReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 7 0 0
2021-03-08SenateCommittee Hearing 03:30
2021-02-15SenateIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee
2021-02-03SenateReceived from House
2021-02-02HouseSecond reading, passed, yeas 81 nays 12
2021-01-27HouseAmendment adopted, placed on calendar
2021-01-26HouseReported back amended, do pass, amendment placed on calendar 8 5 1
2021-01-25HouseCommittee Hearing 11:00
2021-01-11HouseIntroduced, first reading, referred Judiciary Committee

North Dakota State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback